Trustees YMCA EXETER COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity number: 1162431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL REISBACH Chair 11 September 2017
THE SOUTH WEST YMCA TRUST FUND
Received: On time
VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN - DEVON
Received: On time
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Tom Cox Trustee 30 January 2023
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Emma White Trustee 26 September 2022
ST WILFRID'S TRUST
Received: On time
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
Lucy Herring Trustee 26 September 2022
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Louise Beatrice Glanville Trustee 31 January 2022
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Rita Tracey Nardone Trustee 25 November 2019
YMCA CENTRES (SOUTH MOLTON)
Received: On time
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Sara Traynor Trustee 09 September 2019
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Paul John Lambdin Trustee 16 July 2018
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
Dr JONATHAN SNICKER Trustee 11 September 2017
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time
William Thomas McDermid Trustee 20 March 2017
YMCA CENTRES (SOUTH MOLTON)
Received: On time
CITY OF EXETER YMCA
Received: On time