SULLIVAN'S HEROES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of children with disabilities and their families by the provision of grants and financial assistance to adapt their home to accommodate the child's needs as a way of improving their quality of life within their home environment. Sullivan's Heroes operates in the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 August 2015: Standard registration
- SULLIVANS' HEROES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Broderick | Chair | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Cooper | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lia Lunn | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.14k | £337.67k | £273.69k | £197.09k | £139.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.59k | £215.76k | £399.63k | £132.47k | £236.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ADAPT THEIR HOME TO ACCOMMODATE THE CHILD'S NEEDS AS A WAY OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE WITHIN THEIR HOME ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Selsfield Road
Turners Hill
CRAWLEY
RH10 4PW
- Phone:
- 01
- Email:
- hello@sullivansheroes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window