Financial history AMRIT AND AJIT CHARITABLE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1165578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £72.00k £82.19k £50.00k £30.00k £50.00k
Total expenditure £2.26k £8.85k £20.27k £24.34k £12.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A