Trustees GLOBAL INNOVATION FUND
Charity number: 1171353

Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Read | Trustee | 29 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Matthew Weinstein | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Louise Glassman | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Card Kaufman | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Paul Habyarimana | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Roy Clark | Trustee | 06 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Santhosh Mathew | Trustee | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.