HOLME PIERREPONT CANOE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation through the provision of facilities for all aspects of paddle sports including the provision of coaching, equipment, organised trips, competitions and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 10 June 2015: CIO registration
- HPPCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Randall | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Jones | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Randall | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Good | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Steel | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN LAW | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN ALEXANDER SCOTT | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.67k | £23.07k | £60.72k | £66.24k | £55.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.50k | £20.93k | £69.37k | £62.56k | £39.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ALL ASPECTS OF THE SPORT OF CANOEING AND PADDLE SPORTS. (THE TERM 'PADDLE SPORTS' AND 'CANOEING' ARE INCLUSIVE OF ALL FORMS OF CANOEING AND KAYAKING).
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Seymour Road
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 5EF
- Phone:
- 01509504243
- Email:
- Chair@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.