Accounts and annual returns WARRINGTON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1161327
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 April 2022 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 January 2020 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required