Financial history WARRINGTON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1161327
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.43k £15.75k £12.36k £13.18k £6.79k
Total expenditure £16.07k £14.90k £10.08k £11.80k £7.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A