Trustees WARRINGTON SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1161327
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER BUTLER Chair 03 October 2019
None on record
Katherine Molyneux Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Clare Haslam Trustee 20 January 2020
None on record
David Prescott Trustee 19 January 2020
None on record
Mary Prescott Trustee 19 January 2020
None on record
Jill Slack Trustee 19 January 2020
None on record
Lynda Williams Trustee 09 April 2013
None on record
Sheila Hewitt Trustee 01 January 2010
None on record