COLLINGS PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1163248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 07 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 07 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download