COLLINGS PARK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the provision of facilities for recreation within Collings Park with the object of improving the life of local residents. Promoting the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment of Collings Park. Advancing the education of the public by providing facilities and opportunities within Collings Park for learning about the natural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 21 August 2015: CIO registration
- COLLINGS PARK CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW LEIGH | Chair | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Taylor | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liz Rawlings | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.45k | £7.22k | £884 | £2.88k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £1.76k | £5.98k | £2.73k | £1.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PLYMOUTH COMPTON WARD AND SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF COLLINGS PARK IN PLYMOUTH. (III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR PUPILS FROM LOCAL SCHOOLS AND PRE-SCHOOLS, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES WITHIN COLLINGS PARK FOR LEARNING ABOUT THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 FORTESCUE PLACE
PLYMOUTH
PL3 5HT
- Phone:
- 01752267309
- Email:
- andymleigh@aol.com
- Website:
-
collingsparktrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window