INITIATIVE FOR SOCIAL EMPOWERMENT

Charity number: 1162436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.16k £6.06k £0 £32 £0
Total expenditure £16.13k £9.94k £634 £432 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A