Trustees THE CHARTERED ASSOCIATION OF BUSINESS SCHOOLS
Charity number: 1162854

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Robert MacIntosh | Chair | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sankar Sivarajah | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julia May | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Marian Garcia | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eleanor Shaw | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kamil Zakariyya Omoteso | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Mohammad M Ali | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Maria Cassell | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rosalind Toni Hilton | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Heather Kathleen McLaughlin | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BABACK YAZDANI CCMI | Trustee | 20 October 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.