MANOR CHURCH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1163809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £100 £42.21k £30.17k £28.77k £218.40k
Total expenditure £5.62k £52.59k £24.85k £31.71k £218.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A