Bishops Cleeve U3A

Charity number: 1162120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required