Bishops Cleeve U3A

Charity number: 1162120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.11k £8.39k £8.00k £14.78k £11.37k
Total expenditure £6.39k £8.58k £8.56k £11.62k £9.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A