Trustees Bishops Cleeve U3A
Charity number: 1162120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Hall | Trustee | 05 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kirtley Watson | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Van Cleef Larkin | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Anne Hawkins | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Joyce Thompson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Alison Cleverley | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Simon Waller | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheelagh Helen Autef | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marguerite Habgood | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Hayward | Trustee | 07 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.