Financial history CAPEL COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1162194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £50.20k £60.05k £63.65k £47.56k £45.96k
Total expenditure £47.57k £54.12k £58.99k £39.83k £46.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.71k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A