THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP, TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity number: 1163165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £97.46k £112.17k £93.71k £99.80k £91.28k
Total expenditure £95.29k £83.37k £94.48k £96.26k £83.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A