Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP, TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Charity number: 1163165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV RICHARD NATHAN THOMAS | Chair | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Collins | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Morgan Senior | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN PHILIP ROOT | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE JANE ROOT BA HONS | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN LOUISE COX | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JACOB | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAY ELISABETH WILLIAMS BA HONS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS PEARCE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CHRISTOPHER KING | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA WORT | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAY HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE FARNES | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
AILSA HELEN HEMSLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.