SADBERGE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506245
Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £62.58k £58.92k £52.14k £52.49k £40.45k
Total expenditure £60.47k £57.08k £51.65k £52.04k £44.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0