BRAITHWAITE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1162041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time Download