BRAITHWAITE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1162041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £34.24k £33.59k £31.68k £28.45k £34.27k
Total expenditure £42.66k £51.35k £46.95k £22.17k £12.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £28.92k