BRAITHWAITE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1162041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Walter Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
PENNY WOODYER Trustee 05 February 2012 None on record
ANDREW THOBURN Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Elvira Katrina O'Donovan Trustee 01 July 2021 None on record
JOHN CAIN Trustee 24 April 2017
THE ALEX GROUP Received: On time
Stewart Tauber Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Robert Kemp Trustee 16 April 2018 None on record
ANTHONY WOODYER Trustee 10 April 2011 None on record
ANDREW PEPPER Trustee None on record
JUDITH TAUBER Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record