Trustees THE CORNELIUS ARTS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1164716
Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARIANNE VERONIQUE MAGNIN Chair 12 May 2011
None on record
Karim Bouhassoun Trustee 30 March 2020
None on record
Boryana Stambolova Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
SAMALLIE KIYINGI BA, LLB Trustee 31 May 2014
None on record
MR STEVE MOTTERSHEAD Trustee 21 April 2014
None on record
JEANNE PRIVAT Trustee 03 July 2013
None on record
JENNY VAN DROOGENBROECK Trustee 26 June 2013
None on record