MUTUALITE BANA MAMA

Charity number: 1163319
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 July 2020 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 July 2020 174 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 April 2019 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 July 2020 539 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 February 2018 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 February 2018 14 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 April 2017 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 April 2017 64 days late Download