THE CRAMPTON LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1164712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 March 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 March 2020 10 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 08 March 2019 27 January 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 March 2019 30 January 2020 22 days late Download
Annual return 08 March 2018 15 January 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 March 2018 15 January 2019 7 days late Download
Annual return 08 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 March 2017 27 February 2018 50 days late Download