Accounts and annual returns LIVING WATERS DIVINE EAGLES

Charity number: 1166326
Charity reporting is overdue by 1226 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 130 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 130 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 495 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 495 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 860 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 860 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1226 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1226 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window