PENCOMBE AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young Farmers Club for young people from the age of 10 years old which do various activities & hold 2 meetings per calendar month. We enable young people to gain skills and meet socially in a safe friendly environment. We are part of the Herefordshire Federation of Young Farmers Clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 28 April 1977: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 February 2011: Standard registration
- 09 February 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 April 2014: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Mary Legge | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Fryar | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael MacDonald | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
WENDY DAVIES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.35k | £5.24k | £665 | £6.76k | £10.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £5.80k | £704 | £5.58k | £8.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS. FOR FUTHER DETAILES SEE ABOVE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
PENCOME WITH GRENDON WARREN AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORCHARD RISE
LITTLE COWARNE
BROMYARD
HR7 4RQ
- Phone:
- 07812440780
- Email:
- orchardrise@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window