Accounts and annual returns EXCEL NORTH

Charity number: 1164604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 September 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 September 2021 85 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window