Accounts and annual returns YUMI NEPAL EARTHQUAKE APPEAL

Charity number: 1161519
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 226 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 226 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2022 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required