LONDON JEWISH FAMILY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1162132
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 March 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 19 March 2021 80 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 26 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 27 February 2016 08 February 2017 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2016 08 February 2017 43 days late Download