Financial history THE ROYAL WESSEX YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.87k £3.06k £2.89k £3.02k £241
Total expenditure £1.53k £1.59k £1.50k £1.69k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A