Accounts and annual returns FISHER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 December 2019 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 29 January 2018 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 29 January 2018 151 days late Download Open in new window