FRIENDS OF SOLIHULL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506288
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time Download