FRIENDS OF SOLIHULL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506288
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £161.41k £53.08k £48.72k £41.97k £29.94k
Total expenditure £37.15k £207.44k £88.37k £9.19k £46.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A