BASLOW SPORTS FIELD CIO

Charity number: 1164305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Watts Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
Tony Mottram Trustee 17 January 2017 None on record
ANTHONY JOHN BUCKHAM Chair 29 June 2016 None on record
JOHN FRANK WATTS Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
Louis Gay Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Paul Ward Trustee 06 March 2019 None on record
Stuart Cunningham Trustee 07 December 2016 None on record
Neil Dennington Mantell Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
Andrew Knowles Trustee 13 June 2018 None on record
Christine Lyne Trustee 03 May 2017 None on record
PHILIP MORTON Trustee 29 June 2016 None on record
Jonathan Holsgrove Trustee 28 November 2018 None on record
Alison Gaines Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record