OPERATION FISTULA (UK)

Charity number: 1162031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 27 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 27 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 28 February 2017 On time Download