LEEDS PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY (CIO)

Charity number: 1162999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 June 2018 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 28 August 2017 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 28 August 2017 89 days late Download