THE PETER BIBBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1161770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 19 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 26 February 2018 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 28 February 2018 304 days late Download