ST. MARY'S JACOBITE SYRIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH, NORTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1162484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.70k £20.47k £31.74k £30.41k £36.61k
Total expenditure £13.15k £16.57k £25.91k £21.45k £26.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A