Accounts and annual returns HONITON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1162085
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 February 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window