Financial history HONITON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1162085
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £238.54k £211.74k £239.48k £258.26k £275.49k
Total expenditure £242.31k £242.00k £200.91k £215.24k £196.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A