OVERSEAS CHINESE STUDENTS CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 1163886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 11 May 2021 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 November 2019 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 10 December 2018 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required