Trustees WAKEFIELD CONCERT SOCIETY
Charity number: 506324

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Charlotte Deshayes-McCourt | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harold Clark | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Whyte | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Smith | Trustee | 08 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Christine Pollack | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Alexander Hardy | Trustee | 13 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
David John Hopkins | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE SMITH | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.