WHEELIN' WHEELERS

Charity number: 1162614
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.63k £6.64k £40 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.34k £2.50k £3.17k £1.93k £869
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.55k £1.00k N/A N/A N/A