Financial history DRAKE CALLEJA TRUST

Charity number: 1164114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £164.62k £118.76k £295.41k £251.63k £112.97k
Total expenditure £146.13k £134.42k £239.10k £263.57k £128.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A