Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 September 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 April 2021 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2018 31 March 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2017 21 September 2018 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 11 May 2016 18 July 2017 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 May 2016 Not Required