Financial history NATIONAL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1162315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/05/2016 11/05/2017 11/05/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.48k £13.88k £10.35k £10.60k £2.73k
Total expenditure £4.36k £10.09k £5.55k £13.40k £5.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A