Accounts and annual returns CHAPLAINCY CENTRAL

Charity number: 1162985
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 13 June 2022 On time
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 July 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time