THE RESO CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 March 2017 On time Download